skip to content

Truong, Francoise

CPSO#: 89986

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 62009 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Francoise Truong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 13 2013
Corporation Name: Francoise Truong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Truong ( CPSO# 89986 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCOISE TRUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008