skip to content

Trottier, Gregory Thomas

CPSO#: 91723

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Hospital Court
Suite 402
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (647) 350-1155
Fax: (647) 350-1055 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Trottier ( CPSO# 91723 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (647) 350-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY THOMAS TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009