skip to content

Trottier, Carolyn Edith

CPSO#: 112499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Ave
Hanover ON  N4N2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Mar 2020 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN EDITH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Aug 2018 to 23 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2020