skip to content

Trotter, Brendon Gordon

CPSO#: 89039

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jul 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brendon Trotter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trotter ( CPSO# 89039 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 18, 2017, Trillium Health Partners notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Brendon Trotter resigned his privileges on April 7, 2017, during the course of an investigation by Trillium Health Partners into Dr. Trotter’s conviction under the Criminal Code of Canada in November 2015 for impaired driving.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 31 Jul 2017 Active
             As from July 31, 2017, the following term, condition and limitation is imposed
            on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Brendon Gordon Trotter, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Trotter has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Trotter has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
            jurisdictions.  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: November 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On November 9, 2015, Brendon Trotter was found guilty of operating or having the care or control of a motor vehicle while his ability to operate the motor vehicle was impaired by alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Trotter was prohibited from operating a motor vehicle for a period of one year and was ordered to pay a fine of $1000.