skip to content

Trivieri, Maria Giovanna

CPSO#: 86933

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Pisa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital
One Gustave L. Levy Place, Box 1030
New York, NY 10029
New York NY  10029
United States
Phone: 212-241-7983
Fax: 212-241-3684

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0788
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:28 Feb 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA GIOVANNA TRIVIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIVIERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2012