skip to content

Trinh, Tram Khe

CPSO#: 92310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B4
Phone: (519) 355-1888
Fax: (519) 355-0086 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tram Khe Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trinh ( CPSO# 92310 )

Business Address:
11 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 355-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRAM KHE TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009