skip to content

Trinacty, Jill Mary

CPSO#: 100578

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 505-9704 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Trinacty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trinacty ( CPSO# 100578)

Business Address:
Suite 100
575 West Hunt Club Road
Nepean ON  K2G 5W5

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JILL MARY TRINACTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINACTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017