Trickey, Brian Hazen (CPSO#: 29328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7M 1A9
Phone: (613) 766-0318
Fax: (613) 766 0339
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston ON  K7K5V6
Canada
Phone: (613) 766 0318
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Trickey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trickey ( CPSO# 29328 )

Business Address:
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Business Address:
105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston ON  K7K 5V6
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2011

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN HAZEN TRICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRICKEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2018