First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2013 |