skip to content

Tremblay St-Germain, Amelie

CPSO#: 96926

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015