skip to content

Treasurer, Sushila Mahesh

CPSO#: 31051

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Treasurer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St. North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 08 Jun 2020


Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 25 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020