skip to content

Treacy, Ronan Barry Conal

CPSO#: 85540

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008