skip to content

Tran, Tinco

CPSO#: 26001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1996

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1980
Summary:

 In October 1980, Dr. Tran pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Tran guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Tran's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, but that this penalty be itself 
 suspended without terms or conditions.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. Tran be reprimanded.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Oct 1980