Tran, Tina Minh Tam (CPSO#: 100024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Mar 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
8333 Weston Road
Suite 310
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: (905) 850-5607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tina Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tran ( CPSO# 100024)

Business Address:
Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
8333 Weston Road
Suite 310
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Tina Minh Tam Tran may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics.