skip to content

Tran, Thomas

CPSO#: 92929

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tran ( CPSO# 92929 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014