skip to content

Tran, Michael Ngoc Huy

CPSO#: 88544

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Athlone Avenue
Suite 104
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 533-6968
Fax: (519) 533-6969 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tran ( CPSO# 88544 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 533-6968

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NGOC HUY TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013