skip to content

Tran, Maithy Ngoc

CPSO#: 86568

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Walk In Clinic
Unit 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Integra Health Centre
PATH Level - West Wing
C-126 - 199 Bay Street
(accept rheum referrals here only)
Toronto ON  M5L 1E8
Canada
Phone: 416-777-9333
Fax: 416-777-9331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Westmore Wellness Clinic
56 Westmore Drive
Suite 103
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Z7
Canada
Phone: 4167485656
Fax: 4167489829
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maithy Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tran ( CPSO# 86568 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
C-126
199 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5L 1E8

Business Address:
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 515
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4

Business Address:
Golden Mile Walk-In Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAITHY NGOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012