skip to content

Tran, Kim-Chi Doan

CPSO#: 93629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Ave E
Unit 314
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 293-6627
Fax: (416) 293-7362 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kim-Chi Tran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tran ( CPSO# 93629 )

Business Address:
4190 Finch Avenue East
Unit 314
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-6627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:05 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM-CHI DOAN TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Western University, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Western University, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015