Tran, Kim Anh Thi (CPSO#: 88758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
T and T Medical Clinic
Unit 26
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905) 761-7765
Fax: (905) 761-6047
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kim Anh Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tran ( CPSO# 88758 )

Business Address:
T and T Medical Clinic
26 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-7765

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM ANH THI TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2014