skip to content

Trajkovski, Tomce

CPSO#: 86693

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tomce Trajkovski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trajkovski ( CPSO# 86693 )

Business Address:
208 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Business Address:
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TOMCE TRAJKOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAJKOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012