skip to content

Trainor, William Brian

CPSO#: 31861

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone: 519-279-4098
Fax: 519-279-4099 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Trainor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Trainor ( CPSO# 31861 )

Business Address:
103 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 837-1170

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM BRIAN TRAINOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAINOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1980