skip to content

Trachtenberg, John

CPSO#: 29597

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 - 208
620 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Trachtenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trachtenberg ( CPSO# 29597 )

Business Address:
The Prostate Centre
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
620 University Avenue
Suite 3-208
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019