skip to content

Tracey, John Patrick

CPSO#: 26838

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 457-7566
Fax: (905) 457-7611 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Tracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tracey ( CPSO# 26838 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 457-7566


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK TRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRACEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1974