skip to content

Trabelsi, Asma

CPSO#: 87909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:FACULTE DE MEDECINE DE SFAX, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Asma Trabelsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASMA TRABELSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRABELSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 10 Mar 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 28 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010