skip to content

Towns, Kathryn Alexandra

CPSO#: 84717

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 403
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 222-0660
Fax: 416-277-7298 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie ST
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-222-0660
Fax: 416-277-7298
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kathryn Towns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Towns ( CPSO# 84717 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ALEXANDRA TOWNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOWNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010