skip to content

Toupin, Melanie Monique

CPSO#: 95489

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: Savignac, Melanie Monique (used until: 23 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua Allen Michael MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 May Street New Liskeard ON P0J 1P0
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2016