skip to content

Touma, Zahi

CPSO#: 87320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Touma, Zahi Nabih (used until: 23 May 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kursk State Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 1 415 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5248
Fax: (416) 603-9387 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective:01 Apr 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2020 Active
 1. Dr. Zahi Touma may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Touma holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Touma no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.