skip to content

Torres-Trejo, Alejandro

CPSO#: 97475

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Polytechnic Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept. of Neurology, U of Iowa H&C
8936 JPP
200 Hawkins Drive
Iowa City IA  52242
United States
Phone: (319) 356 2571
Fax: (319) 384-7199

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Iowa
USA - New York
USA - North Dakota
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - South Dakota
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:31 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active
 Dr.  Alejandro  Torres-Trejo  may practise medicine independently in neurology,
            only.