skip to content

Torres, Felipe Soares

CPSO#: 88460

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2019
EXPIRY DATE
28 Feb 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Dept of Medical Imaging 4th Floor
263 McCaul Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-6801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: TORRES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Torres ( CPSO# 88460 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst St
Tororonto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: 4166035800

Business Address:
76 Grenville St
Room 2231
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: 4163236186

Business Address:
610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: 4169462000

Business Address:
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: 4165864800

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: 4163404800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Jun 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 30 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Felipe Soares Torres may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which  Dr.  Torres  holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Torres no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Torres' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Torres' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 14, 2019, and expires  on February 28,
                  2022.  Upon renewal of Dr. Torres' academic appointment at the University
                  of  Toronto, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the  limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.