skip to content

Torlakovic, Emina

CPSO#: 92360

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Pathology Room 2845
103 Hospital Dr
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1633

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Goran Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. Emina Torlakovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:05 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011 Active
             Dr. Emina Torlakovic may practise medicine independently in Haematological
            Pathology, only.