skip to content

Toprak, Ayca Melis

CPSO#: 93029

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas St E. WCA Rm 356
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville, ON
K8N5A9
Belleville ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613)771-1251
Fax: 613-771-1917 Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AYCA MELIS TOPRAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOPRAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2018