skip to content

Toor, Jaspreet Kaur

CPSO#: 97431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third St
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 4164536476 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Toor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toor ( CPSO# 97431 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASPREET KAUR TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014