skip to content

Toomey, Patricia Cheryl

CPSO#: 97880

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-6045 Bank Street
Greely ON  K4P 1N3
Phone: 613-804-5163
Fax: 613-216-5163 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patricia C. Toomey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Toomey ( CPSO# 97880 )

Business Address:
6045 Bank Street
Suite 205
Greely ON  K4P 1N3
Phone Number: (613) 804-5163

Business Address:
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: 613-774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:17 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA CHERYL TOOMEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOMEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018