skip to content

Toms, David Andrew

CPSO#: 30618

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.