skip to content

Tome, Daniel William

CPSO#: 97114

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone: (519) 255-9185
Fax: (519) 255-9152 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel Tome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tome ( CPSO# 97114 )

Business Address:
West Windsor Urgent Care Centre
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2A6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9185


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active
 Dr.  Daniel  William  Tome  may  practise  medicine  independently in emergency
            medicine, only.