skip to content

Toma, Jonathan Emanuel

CPSO#: 91357

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
4576 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6N4
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Toma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toma ( CPSO# 91357 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
12399 McCowan Rd
Stouffville ON  L4A 4C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN EMANUEL TOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015