skip to content

Tokarewicz, Alexander Christopher

CPSO#: 24646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. C. Tokarewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tokarewicz ( CPSO# 24646 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHRISTOPHER TOKAREWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOKAREWICZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1972