skip to content

Toi, Ants

CPSO#: 20927

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Apr 2023
EXPIRY DATE
14 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education: University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Toi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toi ( CPSO# 20927 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Room 4-833
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Women's College
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
5th Floor Room 562
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:20 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Apr 2023