skip to content

Toews, Adam Peter

CPSO#: 88466

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre For Addiction and Mental
Health, 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zhou & Toews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toews ( CPSO# 88466 )
Dr. Y. Zhou ( CPSO# 90759 )

Business Address:
1116 - 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Room 7G-116, Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6486

Business Address:
1001 Queen St W
Centre For Addiction and Mental Health
PRT Unit 8
8037
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM PETER TOEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013