skip to content

Toesti, Agnete Lee

CPSO#: 96905

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Norwegian, Swedish

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: (866) 874-4279 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmad-Toesti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ahmad ( CPSO# 92860 )
Dr. A. Toesti ( CPSO# 96905 )

Business Address:
The Plastic Surgery Clinic Inc.
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-7077


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Norway

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGNETE LEE TOESTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOESTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2014