skip to content

Toeg, Hadi Daood Edward

CPSO#: 95839

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst
H1258
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hadi Toeg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Toeg ( CPSO# 95839 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H1258
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HADI DAOOD EDWARD TOEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOEG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2019