skip to content

Young, Todd Kevin

CPSO#: 80782

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 24 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. K. Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 24 Jul 2019


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2019 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 23, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the 
 Discipline Committee found that Dr. Todd Kevin Young committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional; has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and in that the 
 governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that he 
 committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of 
 professional misconduct as defined under Ontario legislation. 
  
 AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION (LIABILITY) 
  
 Dr. Todd Young is 49 years old. He has held a certificate of independent practice with the 
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario since 2004. He also holds a certificate of 
 registration with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador. As of 
 August 2009, he has practised as a family physician in Springdale, Newfoundland.  
  
 Patient A 

 Dr. Young was Patient A’s family physician between August 2009 and February 2011. In 
 addition to being Dr. Young’s patient, Patient A was also employed at the hospital where Dr. 
 Young worked.  
While Patient A was a patient of Dr. Young’s, Dr. Young engaged in a personal relationship with 
Patient A. He socialized with her at work in the doctor’s lounge, in Dr. Young’s office, and in 
the clinic, both during the day and after hours. They discussed matters of a personal nature, 
including that they were both having difficulties in their respective marriages. They exchanged 
personal cell phone numbers, and would text each other throughout the day. 
In February 2011, Dr. Young transferred Patient A’s care to another family physician in order to 
 pursue a romantic relationship with Patient A. After the termination of the physician-patient 
relationship, Dr. Young and Patient A continued to be work colleagues, and their relationship 
became romantic. Dr. Young and Patient A began dating in August 2011, and began having 
sexual intercourse in approximately late 2011/early 2012. Their relationship ended in 
approximately 2014. 
In engaging in the conduct described above, Dr. Young engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Patient B 
 
Dr. Young was Patient B’s family physician between August 2009 and January 2014. In 
November 2013, Dr. Young and Patient B exchanged personal cell phone numbers. During a 
period of three months, while Patient B was a patient of Dr. Young’s, Dr. Young engaged in a 
romantic relationship with Patient B, consisting of communications via text and over the 
telephone about personal matters, including Patient B’s separation from her husband, and 
hugging and kissing on a couple of occasions. 
In engaging in the conduct described at paragraph above, Dr. Young engaged in sexual abuse of 
 Patient B, and in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all 
 the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. 
  
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador 

 On November 26, 2015, Dr. Young appeared before the Adjudication Tribunal of the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador and pleaded guilty to an allegation that 
 he had engaged in “conduct deserving of sanction”, as defined in s. 39(c) of the Medical Act, 
 2011, c. M-4.02.  Under s. 39(c) of the Medical Act, 2011: 
 39. (c) “conduct deserving of sanction” includes: 
  
       (i)   professional misconduct, 
       (ii)  professional incompetence, 
       (iii) conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner, 
       (iv) incapacity or unfitness to engage in the practice of medicine, and 
       (v) acting in breach of this Act, the regulations or the code of ethics adopted under 
       section 15 [emphasis  added]. 
                    
 Dr. Young pleaded guilty to engaging in conduct deserving of sanction with respect to his 
 conduct towards Patients A and B, as set out above. 
 For reasons released December 15, 2018, the Adjudication Tribunal of the College of Physicians 
 and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador found Dr. Young “guilty of conduct deserving of 
 sanction in relation to his personal and sexual relationship with Patient A with whom he had a 
 doctor/patient relationship, and in relation to his inappropriate kissing and hugging with patient 
 B with whom he had a doctor/patient relationship”. 
 The governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario, namely the 
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Newfoundland and Labrador, found that Dr. Young 
committed: 
      a)    an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct 
             under section 51 of the Code, specifically, sexual abuse of a patient (Patient B); 
             and  
       b)    an act of professional misconduct as defined in O. Reg. 856/93, specifically, an 
             act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
             circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
             dishonourable or unprofessional (Patients A and B). 

 ADMISSION 

 Dr. Young admits the facts above, and admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in 
 professional misconduct under: 
       a) paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
          1991(“O. Reg. 856/93”), in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
          practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
         regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; 
       
      b) clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which is schedule 2 to 
         the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the “Code”), in that he 
         has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and 
       
      c) clause 51(1)(b) of the Code, in that the governing body of a health profession in a 
         jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Young committed an act of 
         professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of 
         professional misconduct under section 51 of the Code or an act of professional 
         misconduct as defined in O. Reg. 856/93. 
       
DISPOSITION 
 
The Committee Ordered that: 
 
   -  Dr. Young attend before the panel to be reprimanded 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Young’s certificate of registration for six (6) months;  
   -  Dr. Young pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 23. 2019 9:00 a.m. start

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.