skip to content

Todd, Justin Andrew

CPSO#: 93285

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-2120 Regent St
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: 7055229101 Ext. 2
Fax: 7055665442 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. A. Todd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Todd ( CPSO# 93285 )

Business Address:
2120 Regent Street South
Unit 2
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTIN ANDREW TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015