Tobola, Elizabeth Christine (CPSO#: 100731)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015