skip to content

Tlusty, Eva

CPSO#: 28829

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Oct 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Gam X Ray DG Imaging 18 Kensington Rd Unit 206 Brampton, ON L6T 4S5
Date Received: 06 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2017