Titus, Talianne Nicole (CPSO#: 97196)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 09 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2014