skip to content

Titcombe, Archibald Frederick

CPSO#: 18011

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 22-Mar-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1994