skip to content

Tisseverasinghe, Annaliese

CPSO#: 88199

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8054 Yonge Street Thornhill, ON L4J 1W3
Date Received: 07 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2015