skip to content

Tisdall, Gordon William

CPSO#: 19537

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
13 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Tisdall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2021

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can send a written request to: Suite 1104- 50 Prince Arthur Avenue, Toronto, Ontario M5R 1B5
Date Received: 03 Feb 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 2021