skip to content

Tinmouth, Alan Hall

CPSO#: 29573

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2015